EP2988431 - BEAM TRAINING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chung-Ang University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation Chung-Ang University 47 Heukseok-ro Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-756 / KR | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Chung-Ang University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation Chung-Ang University 47 Heukseok-ro Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-756 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yong Soo 25-1006 Sinbanpo Hansin Apt. 10 Sinbanpo-ro 19-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-042 / KR | 02 /
KU, Bon Woo 501-1106 Prugio Apt. 123 Gwangdeok 2-ro Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-903 / KR | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2016/08] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 13887663.6 | 10.12.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013KR11417 | Priority number, date | KR20130075723 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130075723 | KR20130120578 | 10.10.2013 Original published format: KR 20130120578 | [2016/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014208844 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988431 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2988431 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H01Q3/24, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04W28/18, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H01Q3/24 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B7/063 (EP,US);
H04B7/0634 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US);
H04B7/0684 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/0851 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | H04B7/04, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLTRAININGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2016/08] | English: | BEAM TRAINING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2016/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE FAISCEAUX | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2015 | Translation filed | 16.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 24.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 10.12.2018 | LU | 10.12.2018 | MT | 10.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | FR | 14.01.2019 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GB | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GB | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GB | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009117436 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 24,31 * paragraphs [0094] - [0165]; figures 5,24 *[A] 25-30,32-37 | International search | [Y]US2010118839 (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al); | [Y]US2010214169 (KAFLE PADAM LAL [US]); | [Y]KR20110069176 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [Y]KR20110129481 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]US2012257606 (SAMPATH HEMANTH [US], et al) |