EP3014389 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARACTER INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Peng 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 02 /
DU, Lin 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Guanghua 8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center No. 8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Huchet, Anne, et al Technicolor European Patent Operation 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13888464.8 | 25.06.2013 | [2016/18] | WO2013CN77832 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205639 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014389 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F1/32, G06F3/03 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06V30/347 (US);
G06F1/325 (EP,US);
G06F3/005 (US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZEICHENEINGABE | [2016/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARACTER INPUT | [2016/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR UNE ENTRÉE DE CARACTÈRE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 16.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004041794 (KIDODE MASATSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] *; | [I]US2011041100 (BOILLOT MARC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0057]; figures 1-20 *; | [I]US2011254765 (BRAND MICHAEL [AU]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0039]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US8094941 (ROWLEY HENRY A [US], et al) [A] 4* column 3, line 29 - column 11, line 3; figures 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US2012119062 (DE COI BEAT [CH], et al); | [A]CN102508546 (TPV DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY XIAMEN); | [Y]US2012317516 (OHSUMI TSUYOSHI [JP]) |