EP3026159 - CARBON NANOTUBE YARN PRODUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/22] | THREAD PRODUCTION DEVICE | ||
[2017/34] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASHIMA Hiroki c/o Murata Machinery Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 13890206.9 | 22.07.2013 | [2016/22] | WO2013JP69798 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015011761 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026159 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/16, D01F9/127, D01H13/04, D01H1/04 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
D02G3/16 (EP,US);
B65H51/015 (EP,US);
B65H54/2896 (EP,US);
D01G99/00 (US);
D01H1/04 (EP,US);
D01H1/115 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | D02G3/16, D01F9/127 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFF-NANORÖHRCHEN GARNHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/34] | English: | CARBON NANOTUBE YARN PRODUCTION DEVICE | [2017/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE FIL EN NANOTUBES DE CARBONE | [2017/34] |
Former [2016/22] | GEWINDEHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/22] | THREAD PRODUCTION DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/22] | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE FIL | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2016 | Translation filed | 13.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP17205110.4 / EP3312320 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4235070 (BRAVIN BEN [US]) [A] 11 * column 9, line 5 - column 10, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2012127814 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047]; figure 2 * | [X] - TRAN C.D., HUMPHRIES W., SMITH S.M., HUYNH C., LUCAS S., "Improving the tensile strength of carbon nanotube spun yarns using a modified spinning process", CARBON, (20090527), vol. 47, no. 11, doi:/10.1016/j.carbon.2009.05.020, pages 2662 - 2670, XP002769141 [X] 1,7,10 * 3 Modified dry spinning process; page 2664 - page 2665; figures 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0008622309003212 | [X] - MIAO M., MCDONNELL J., VUCKOVIC L., HAWKINS S.C., "Poisson's ratio and porosity of carbon nanotube dry-spun yarns", CARBON, (20100410), vol. 48, no. 10, doi:/10.1016/j.carbon.2010.04.009, pages 2802 - 2811, XP002769142 [X] 1,10 * 2.1 CNT yarn production; page 2803; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2010.04.009 | [A] - JAYASINGHE C., CHAKRABARTI S., SCHULZ M.J., SHANOV V., "Spinning yarn from long carbon nanotube arrays", JOURNAL OF MATERIAL RESEARCH, (20110128), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:/10.1557/jmr.2010.91, pages 645 - 651, XP002769143 [A] 11 * page 649, column 2; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://doi.org/10.1557/jmr.2010.91 | International search | [A]JP2010116632 (OSAKA PREFECTURE, et al); | [A]JP2011153392 (OSAKA PREFECTURE, et al) | by applicant | JP2010116632 | JP3954967B |