EP3043650 - CARBON DIOXIDE AND SALINE NASAL DELIVERY METHODS AND DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glynn, Kenneth P. 29 Plennert Rd. Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13893220.7 | 10.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013US00207 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015038092 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3043650 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/185, A61K33/14, A01N59/04, A61K9/00, A61P11/02, A61M11/02 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
A61M11/007 (EP);
A61K33/00 (EP);
A61K33/14 (EP);
A61M11/02 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (EP);
A61M15/0031 (EP);
A61M16/14 (EP);
A61M2202/0225 (EP);
A61M2210/0618 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61M2202/0225, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | A61K31/185, A61K33/14, A01N59/04, A61K9/00, A61P11/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/29] | A01N59/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUR NASALEN VERABREICHUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID UND KOCHSALZLÖSUNG UND VERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/29] | English: | CARBON DIOXIDE AND SALINE NASAL DELIVERY METHODS AND DELIVERY DEVICES | [2016/29] | French: | MÉTHODES D'ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE NASALE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ET DE SÉRUM PHYSIOLOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION ASSOCIÉS | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 27.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 27.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2017 | 30.09.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2019 | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012170677 (PARION SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5,13 * claim - * * claim - *; | [XI]JP2003040766 (KAO CORP, et al) [X] 6-8,10-12 * example - * [I] 1-5,9,13; | [I]DE20121474U (ZELLNER GERHARD [DE]) [I] 1-5,13 * claim - *; | [I]WO2005077189 (CORDRAY SCOTT [US]) [I] 1-5,13 * claim - *; | [I]CN1669559 (LIU ZHANXIN [CN]) [I] 1-5,13 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2013123417 (CAPNIA INC [US]) [X] 6-8,10-12 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] * [I] 9; | [I]US2009216183 (MINOTTI AMERICO MICHAEL [US]) [I] 6-12 * figure - * | [X] - Anonymous, "Emser Nasenspülsalz - Emser.de", (20130817), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130817071034/http://www.emser.de/emser-produkte/emser-nasenspuelsalz, (20170405), XP055362236 [X] 1-5,13 * the whole document * | [X] - Novartis, "Rhinomer plus Nasenspray", (20090812), URL: https://www.mediherz-shop.de/images/ecommerce/01/80/01802262_1970-01_de_s.pdf, (20170908), XP055405022 [X] 6-8,10-12 * the whole document * | [XI] - Degenhard Marx, "Intranasal Saline: Can a Spray Per Day Keep the Doctor Away?", (20130312), URL: http://www.drug-dev.com/Main/Back-Issues/Intranasal-Saline-Can-a-Spray-Per-Day-Keep-the-Doc-530.aspx, (20170908), XP055405129 [X] 6-8,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 9 | International search | [Y]US2011046546 (RASOR NED S [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013063413 (AMPIO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [Y]US2009236374 (PARDES GREG [US], et al) |