EP2993735 - RAIL BOND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Tecs Co. Ltd. 1743-4 Yakuoji Koga-shi Fukuoka 811-3124 / JP | For all designated states Fukuoka Prefectural Government 7-7 Higashikoen Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8577 / JP | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINAGA Kenichi c/o SHOWA TECS CO. LTD. 1743-4 Yakuouji Koga-shi Fukuoka 811-3124 / JP | 02 /
EGASHIRA Takaki c/o SHOWA TECS CO. LTD. 1743-4 Yakuouji Koga-shi Fukuoka 811-3124 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA Kenji c/o MECHANICS AND ELECTRONICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE FUKUOKA INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY CENTER 6-1 Norimatsu 3-Chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 807-0831 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO Keiichiro c/o MECHANICS AND ELECTRONICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE FUKUOKA INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY CENTER 6-1 Norimatsu 3-Chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 807-0831 / JP | 05 /
TAKAMIYA Yoshihiro c/o MECHANICS AND ELECTRONICS RESEARCH INSTITUTE FUKUOKA INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY CENTER 6-1 Norimatsu 3-Chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 807-0831 / JP | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 13893406.2 | 13.09.2013 | [2016/10] | WO2013JP74788 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015037112 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993735 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/64, B23K1/00, B60M5/00, E01B11/00, H01R4/02, // B23K101/26, B23K101/38, B23K103/04 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B60M5/00 (EP,US);
B23K1/0008 (EP,US);
E01B11/00 (US);
H01R4/029 (EP,US);
B23K2101/26 (EP,US);
B23K2101/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | H01R4/64, B23K1/00, B60M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | SCHIENENBINDUNG | [2016/10] | English: | RAIL BOND | [2016/10] | French: | LIAISON DE RAIL | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | Translation filed | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 04.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2296680 (FOND METALL AOZT [RU]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,14,19 * abstract *; | [X]WO2008037714 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,19 * page 9 - page 13; figures 1-5 *; | [IA]JPH01109668 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD, et al) [I] 1-5,7-12,16-19 * abstract * [A] 6,13-15; | [A]US2008217042 (JUDSON WARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]JP3179612U (SHINGO KIZAI KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | International search | [XE]JP2013214423 (SHOWA TEKKUSU KK, et al); | [X]WO2008126215 (SHOWA TECS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008073762 (FCI CONNECTORS SINGAPORE PTE); | [A]WO2008047437 (SHOWA TECS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006112473 (SHOWA TECS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004082204 (NICHU GIKEN KOGYO KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH0732839 | JP2004273403 |