EP3044653 - DETECTING GESTURES ON THE SIDE OF A COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Min 15828 NW Hackney Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Hufton, David Alan, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13893475.7 | 12.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013US59537 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015038133 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044653 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/01 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/04182 (EP);
G06F3/01 (US);
G06F1/1692 (US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/04184 (US);
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | COMPUTERSEITIGE GESTENERKENNUNG | [2016/29] | English: | DETECTING GESTURES ON THE SIDE OF A COMPUTING DEVICE | [2016/29] | French: | DÉTECTION DE GESTES CÔTÉ DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2013167992 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * figure 1 * [A] 8,13[I] 3,5-7,9-12 | International search | [A]WO2007112172 (SYNAPTICS INC [US], et al); | [A]KR20090106109 (MELFAS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2011205172 (KITADA TAKASHI [JP]); | [A]US2012249476 (SCHWARTZ ADAM [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013126098 (CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al) |