EP3050690 - MULTI-CHAMBER TIRE MANUFACTURING MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chengdu Youyang Electromechanical Product Design Co., Ltd. Group 1 Hongzhuan Village Wanchun Town Wenjiang Chengdu Sichuan 611130 / CN | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Shugang Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Bao'an Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Shaobo Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Bao'an Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xiaoling Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Bao'an Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 04 /
WU, Xingyin Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Bao'an Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 05 /
PENG, Lei Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Bao'an Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 13894096.0 | 25.09.2013 | [2016/31] | WO2013CN84139 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042788 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050690 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050690 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/02, B29D30/06, B29C33/48, B60C5/24 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B29D30/0606 (EP,US);
B29D30/0061 (EP,KR,US);
B29C33/30 (EP,KR,US);
B29C33/48 (EP,KR,US);
B29D30/02 (EP,US);
B29D30/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | B29C33/30, B29D30/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/31] | B29C33/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKAMMERREIFENHERSTELLUNGSFORM | [2016/31] | English: | MULTI-CHAMBER TIRE MANUFACTURING MOLD | [2016/31] | French: | MOULE DE FABRICATION DE PNEU MULTICHAMBRE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | Translation filed | 25.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2013 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | IE | 25.09.2020 | LU | 25.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.09.2013 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 25.12.2019 | |
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 25.12.2019 | |
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB212437 (O & W COMPANY) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]GB399356 (MAURICE BAUDOU, et al) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]US3901300 (TOPLIS JOHN GEOFFREY) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]US4267873 (MCCOLL BRUCE J) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]EP0668136 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-11* figure - *; | [A]JP2010131864 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * figure - * | International search | [A]EP0668136 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]JP2006281709 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]CN101219567 (HAOHUA S CN GUILIN RUBBER CO [CN]); | [A]CN201760991U (SICHUAN YUANXING RUBBER CO LTD) |