EP3050106 - LOW LEAKAGE NON-PLANAR ACCESS TRANSISTOR FOR EMBEDDED DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMEORY (EDRAM) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Joodong 2203 NW Jessamine Way Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
BHIMARASETTI, Gopinath 14802 NW Deerfoot Lane Portland, OR 97229 / US | 03 /
RAMASWAMY, Rahul 2501 NW 229th Avenue Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 04 /
JAN, Chia-Hong 12849 NW Lorraine Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | 05 /
HAFEZ, Walid M. 4060 NW Carlton Court Portland, OR 97229 / US | 06 /
YEH, Jeng-Ya D. 15115 NW Decatur Way Portland, OR 97229 / US | 07 /
TSAI, Curtis 15021 SW Telluride Terrace Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/47] |
Former [2016/31] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13894350.1 | 27.09.2013 | [2016/31] | WO2013US62312 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015047315 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050106 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050106 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/108, H01L21/8242, H01L29/66, H01L29/78 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/66545 (EP,US);
H10B12/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/823431 (KR);
H01L29/66795 (KR,US);
H01L29/66818 (EP);
H01L29/785 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | H01L27/108, H01L21/8242 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STREUFELDARMER NICHT PLANARER ZUGANGSTRANSISTOR FÜR EINEN EINGEBETTETEN DYNAMISCHEN DIREKTZUGRIFFSSPEICHER (EDRAM) | [2016/31] | English: | LOW LEAKAGE NON-PLANAR ACCESS TRANSISTOR FOR EMBEDDED DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMEORY (EDRAM) | [2016/31] | French: | TRANSISTOR D'ACCÈS NON PLANAR À FAIBLES FUITES POUR MÉMOIRE VIVE DYNAMIQUE EMBARQUÉE (EDRAM) | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2020 | 12.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20194428.7 / EP3767672 | EP22165476.7 / EP4044249 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
TR | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007004146 (PRINZ ERWIN J [US], et al); | [IA]US2008242012 (PAE SANGWOO [US], et al); | [A]US2011260255 (WANG WENWU [CN], et al); | [A]US2012139062 (YUAN JUN [US], et al); | [XA]US2013082304 (LIU CHI-WEN [TW], et al); | [XAI]US2013200455 (LO WEN-CHENG [TW], et al); | [IA]US2013200470 (LIU AN-CHI [TW], et al) | International search | [A]US6764884 (YU BIN [US], et al); | [A]US2005153492 (AHMED SHIBLY S [US], et al); | [Y]US2007026615 (GOKTEPELI SINAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2008084731 (LEE CHUL [KR], et al); | [Y]US2009200616 (SHIMIZU TATSUO [JP], et al) | Examination | US2005167754 |