EP3055547 - FUEL FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarcor Engine Mobile Solutions, LLC 840 Crescent Centre Dr., Suite 600 Franklin TN 37067 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTALE, Chandrakant Siddharam 320 Saint Pauls Ave Apt 1A Jersey City, NJ 07306-5068 / US | 02 /
DUTIL, Kenneth D. 1 Barberry Lane Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/34] |
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
KOTALE, Chandrakant Siddharam 465 Buckland Hills Drive Apt. 35321 Manchester, CT 06042 / US | ||
02 /
DUTIL, Kenneth D. 1 Barberry Lane Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13894953.2 | 02.10.2013 | [2016/33] | WO2013US63047 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015050540 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055547 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/22, B01D35/02 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
F02M37/42 (EP,US);
B01D2201/295 (EP);
B01D2201/302 (EP);
B01D2201/347 (EP);
B01D2201/4084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFFILTERPATRONE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/33] | English: | FUEL FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2016/33] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE À CARBURANT ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006175246 (KOMINE AKIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 12 * figure 4 * [A] 1-11,13-20; | [XAI]US2011079550 (KOCKSCH CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 12-14 * figure 1 * [A] 1-11,16-20 [I] 15; | [X]WO2012095124 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 12* figure 1 * | International search | [A]KR19980036372 (KIA MOTORS CORPORATION); | [A]JP2006026633 (ARVINMERITOR TECHNOLOGY LLC); | [A]US2007246417 (WRIGHT ALLEN B [US], et al); | [A]KR100841419B (UFI FILTERS S.P.A.); | [A]US8277531 (BROWN GENE W [US], et al) |