EP3071753 - A MIXTURE FOR A ROAD FORMATION AND METHODS FOR BLENDING AND COMPACTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKECROFT TRUST Suite 116 10 Kenrick Street The Junction NSW 2291 / AU | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Stabilco Intellectual Property Limited Suite 1203 12/F Tower 3 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCE, Simon P.O. Box 563 Maitland, New South Wales 2320 / AU | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13894954.0 | 02.10.2013 | [2016/39] | WO2013AU01127 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015048838 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071753 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E01C3/06, E01C7/04, E01C21/00 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
E01C3/06 (EP);
E01C21/00 (EP);
E01C7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | GEMISCH ZUR FORMUNG VON STRASSEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR MISCHUNG UND VERDICHTUNG DAVON | [2016/39] | English: | A MIXTURE FOR A ROAD FORMATION AND METHODS FOR BLENDING AND COMPACTION THEREOF | [2016/39] | French: | MÉLANGE POUR CONSTRUCTION DE ROUTES ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE MÉLANGE ET DE COMPACTAGE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 28.03.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.06.2016 | 31.10.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7448825 (KASAHARA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * figure 2 * * column 22, line 54 - column 23, line 21 * * the whole document * * column 27, line 22 - line 26 *; | [X]EP0467483 (TWENTSE RECYCLING MIJ [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-9,14,15 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 29 * * page 10, line 6 - line 25 * * claim 11 * * the whole document *; | [X]US4383864 (TRUJILLO JOSE A) [X] 1-4,14,15 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 16 * * column 10, line 53 - line 60 * * column 19, line 12 - line 20 * * column 21, line 51 - column 22, line 30 * * the whole document *; | [X]GB2483690 (LAWRENCE PETER LESLIE [GB]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [X]US2013045049 (KRZYZAK GERALD [US]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * figures 1-4 * * the whole document * | [XI] - "Roads and Maritime Services (RMS) QA Specification 3051, Granular Base and Subbase Materials for surfaced road pavements (Ed 6/Rev 2)", ROADS AND MARITIME SERVICES (RMS) QA SPECIFICA, US, (20110401), vol. 3051, pages 1 - 37, XP008182024 [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * page 9, paragraph 8 - page 12 * * the whole document * [I] 13 | International search | [X]US7448825 (KASAHARA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0467483 (TWENTSE RECYCLING MIJ [NL]); | [X]US4383864 (TRUJILLO JOSE A); | [XL] - "Roads and Maritime Services (RMS) QA Specification 3051, Granular Base and Subbase Materials for surfaced road pavements", (201104), URL: HTTP://WWW.RMS.NSW.GOV.AU/DOINGBUSINESSWITHUS/SPECIFICATIONS/SPECS825701/305_1_E6_R2.PDF, (20140210), XP008182024 | [AL] - "Pavement construction WALA, Aggregate Roadbase Description", (20110208), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.wala.com/flash/asphalt.pdf, (20140210), XP055292389 | [L] - "DSA Specification and Certification, Driving Surface Aggregate Certification, Dirt and Gravel Road Maintenance Program", URL: http://www.dirtandgravel.psu.edu/resources/documents/DS_Spec_and_Certification.pdf, XP055306061 |