EP3065057 - DATA STORAGE DEVICE, DATA STORAGE METHOD, AND DATA STORAGE PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Mari c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
NAKADA, Shigeki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
UMEMOTO, Yasutaka c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 13896240.2 | 28.10.2013 | [2016/36] | WO2013JP79177 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063845 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065057 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/16, H04N5/907, H04N5/91, H04N5/77, H04N21/4335 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
G06F3/0623 (US);
G06F12/16 (EP,US);
G06F3/064 (US);
G06F3/0653 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | G06F12/16, H04N5/907, H04N5/91 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENSPEICHERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENSPEICHERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2016/36] | English: | DATA STORAGE DEVICE, DATA STORAGE METHOD, AND DATA STORAGE PROGRAM | [2016/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE MÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES ET PROGRAMME DE MÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | Translation filed | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001222731 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US7158167 (YERAZUNIS WILLIAM S [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 19-25 * * column 2, lines 53-67 * * column 7, lines 7-22 * * column 8, lines 43-61 * * column 9, lines 34-42 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]JP2010224789 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0070] ** figure 11 * | International search | [X]JPH1066061 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JP2012169754 (YAZAKI CORP); | [X]JP2013182573 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) | by applicant | JP2000196996 | JP2011172256 |