EP3039436 - METHOD FOR MULTIPLEXING WHEATSTONE BRIDGE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONDARENKO, Oleg 91 Bryce Branch Circle Spring, Texas 77382 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Wei 5339 Rutherglenn Drive Houston, Texas 77032 / US | 03 /
GLENN, Timothy S. 59 Burns Hill Drive Dracut, Massachusetts01826 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13900638.1 | 31.12.2013 | [2016/27] | WO2013US78479 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015102613 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039436 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G08C15/02, G08C19/04, G01R17/02, G01V1/40, G01V3/18, G01R19/25 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G01R17/02 (EP,US);
G01R19/2509 (EP,US);
G08C15/02 (EP,US);
G08C19/04 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G01V1/22 (EP,US);
G01V1/245 (EP,US);
G01V3/26 (EP,US);
G01V3/34 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/823 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | G01R17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MULTIPLEXEN VON WHEATSTONE-BRÜCKE-MESSUNGEN | [2016/27] | English: | METHOD FOR MULTIPLEXING WHEATSTONE BRIDGE MEASUREMENTS | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MULTIPLEXAGE DES MESURES D'UN PONT DE WHEATSTONE | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005012588 (SULTAN MICHEL F [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-11,13-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * [A] 6,7,12; | [Y]US5493906 (SEN-ZHI SHENG [CN]) [Y] 1-5,8-11,13-15 * column 3, lines 11-65 * * column 5, lines 19-30 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 10 * | International search | [Y]US2009056466 (MORAN MICHAEL E [US], et al); | [Y]US5493906 (SEN-ZHI SHENG [CN]); | [A]US2005239230 (YANG XIAOFENG [US], et al); | [A]US6304074 (WAFFENSCHMIDT EBERHARD [DE]); | [A]US2006005619 (RENNINGER ERHARD [DE], et al) |