EP3079398 - NEIGHBOR CELL MEASUREMENT METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XUE, Lixia Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Jingyuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13900695.1 | 30.12.2013 | [2016/41] | WO2013CN90957 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015100556 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079398 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3079398 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, // H04W84/04, H04W36/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/0061 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHBARZELLENMESSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2016/41] | English: | NEIGHBOR CELL MEASUREMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | [2016/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURAGE DE CELLULE VOISINE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2016 | Translation filed | 06.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2013 | AL | 27.06.2018 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | GB | 30.12.2018 | IE | 30.12.2018 | IT | 30.12.2018 | LU | 30.12.2018 | MT | 30.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 30.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
MT | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 30.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
MT | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 30.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
MT | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 30.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 30.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 30.12.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IT | 30.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013007207 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * [Y] 2-7,9-14; | [E]EP2733982 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055] *; | [XY] - NEW POSTCOM, "CSI-RS based RRM measurement for synchronised new carriers", vol. RAN WG1, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121102), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-124949, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_71/Docs/, (20121102), XP050662670 [X] 1,8 * chapters 2.2 and 2.3 * [Y] 2-7,9-14 | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, "Small Cell Discovery for Efficient Small Cell On/Off Operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133457, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716565 [A] 1-14 * chapter 3.2 * | International search | [X]CN102685795 (NEW POSTCOM EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [A]CN102883408 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN103458458 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |