EP2770113 - Quick-connection hydraulic coupling joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andrina, Giovanni Via Torino, 56 10080 Bosconero (TO) / IT | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [2016/18] |
Former [2014/35] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 14000282.5 | 28.01.2014 | [2014/35] | Priority number, date | IT2013TO00138 | 20.02.2013 Original published format: IT TO20130138 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770113 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2770113 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
E02F3/3654 (EP,US);
F16L37/367 (US);
Y10T137/9029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2014/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Schnellverbindungskupplungsgelenk | [2014/35] | English: | Quick-connection hydraulic coupling joint | [2014/35] | French: | Joint de couplage hydraulique à raccord rapide | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | LU | 28.01.2017 | MT | 28.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/52] | AL | 04.05.2016 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 04.05.2016 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 04.05.2016 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1566490 (WIMMER ALOIS [AT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figures 6,7 *; | [A]WO2008071012 (OSCAR MEIER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10* page 11, paragraph 1; figure 9 *; | [A]EP2230435 (CATERPILLAR WORK TOOLS BV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP1566490 | WO2008071012 | EP2230435 |