EP2813908 - Bulk device preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. 70 Mechanic Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2021/14] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. 38 Neponset Avenue, C42-12 Foxboro, MA 02035-2037 / US | ||
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Invensys Systems, Inc. 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035-2099 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piper, Charles W. 24 Valley Forge Way Foxboro, Massachusetts 02035 / US | 02 /
Kostadinov, Vladimir 205 Mansfield Street Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2014/51] | Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14000943.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2014/51] | Priority number, date | US201313828366 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313828366 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2813908 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2813908 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813908 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0853, H04L41/22, G05B19/042 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B23/0272 (US);
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25067 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2014/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schüttgutvorrichtungsherstellung | [2014/51] | English: | Bulk device preparation | [2014/51] | French: | Préparation de dispositif en vrac | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5980078 (KRIVOSHEIN KEN D [US], et al) [I] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 4-10,14-20; | [IA]US2005055111 (LAW GARY K [US], et al) [I] 1-3,11-13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 4-10,14-20; | [A]US2005125085 (PRASAD RAGHAVENDRA T [IN], et al) [A] 6 * paragraph [0032] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] *; | [I]US2011191500 (ODAYAPPAN JAYAMANI [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011080955 (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] *; | [A] - "800xA Device Management and Fieldbus Overview", (20101231), URL: http://www05.abb.com/global/scot/scot349.nsf/veritydisplay/4b7d270eb6928987c1257837004a37a3/$file/3bdd013081_l_d_en_system_800xa_5.1_device_management_overview.pdf, (20131003), XP055082479 [A] 1,11 * page 15 * |