EP2878743 - Assembly for forming a floor covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuijper Modell- und Formenbau GmbH Felbenstrasse 18 9403 Goldach / CH | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuijper, Ivo Schöneggstrasse 11 9404 Rorschacherberg / CH | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/23] | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 50 6830 Rankweil / AT | Application number, filing date | 14002122.1 | 20.06.2014 | [2015/23] | Priority number, date | AT20130000333U | 14.10.2013 Original published format: AT 3332013 U | [2017/03] |
Former [2015/23] | AT20130000333 | 14.10.2013 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2878743 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2878743 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
E04F15/02044 (EP,AT);
E01C5/005 (AT);
E04F15/02452 (AT);
E04F15/02138 (AT);
E04F15/02144 (AT);
E04F15/02183 (EP);
E04F2015/02072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Ausbildung eines Bodenbelags | [2015/23] | English: | Assembly for forming a floor covering | [2015/23] | French: | Agencement destiné à la formation d'un revêtement de sol | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2014 | AL | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | MT | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.06.2014 | |
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.06.2014 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0149770 (AGROB WESSEL SERVAIS AKTIENGES) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,13,15 * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 15 * * page 11, line 8 - line 23 * * figures 1,2,7 * [A] 9,11,12,14 [I] 5; | [XDAI]US2009094925 (ANDRES WILFRIED [FR], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,6,7,10-15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0066] , [0067] , [0076] , [0082] , [0083] , [0084] * * figures 1-5,9,16,20 * [A] 2 [I] 5,8,9; | [XAI]EP0133868 (AGROB WESSEL SERVAIS AKTIENGES [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,13,15 * page 1, line 7 - line 16 * * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 18 * * page 3, line 4 - line 15 * [A] 9,11,12,14 [I] 4,5; | [XAI]NL1005401C (TOM RONALD OFFERS [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,10,13,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 13 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 8 - line 15 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 3 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,9,11,12,14 [I] 3,6-8; | [A]DE202007002282U (MOELLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,8,9 * | by applicant | DE10150889 | US2009094925 | WO2006011173 |