EP2827119 - Adapter for fixation of motorcycles on roller test benches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vysoka skola banska - Technicka univerzita Ostrava 17. listopadu 15/2172 70833 Ostrava-Poruba / CZ | [2016/31] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Vysoka Skola Banska - Technicka Univerzita Ostrava 17. listopdau 15/2172 70833 Ostrava-Poruba / CZ | ||
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Vysoká Skola Bánská - Technická Univerzita Ostrava 17 Listopadu 15/2172 708 33 Ostrava-Poruba / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smiraus, Jakub Krchleby 17 78901 Zabreh / CZ | 02 /
Famfulik, Jan Bohumira Cetyny 4 70830 Ostrava 3 / CZ | 03 /
Mikova, Jana Na Svobode 3131 72300 Ostrava-Martinov / CZ | 04 /
Richtar, Michal Sokolovska 1187 70800 Ostrava 8 / CZ | [2016/31] |
Former [2016/25] | 01 /
Smiraus, Jakub Krchleby 17 78901 Zabreh / CZ | ||
02 /
Famulik, Jan B. Cetyny 4 70830 Ostrava 3 / CZ | |||
03 /
Míková, Jana Na Svobode 3131 72300 Ostrava-Martinov / CZ | |||
04 /
Richtar, Michal Sokolovska 1187 70800 Ostrava 8 / CZ | |||
Former [2015/04] | 01 /
Miraus, Jakub Krchleby 17 789 01 Záb?eh / CZ | ||
02 /
Famfulik, Jan B. ?etyny 4 700 30 Ostrava 3 / CZ | |||
03 /
Míková, Jana Na Svobod? 3131 723 00 Ostrava - Martinov / CZ | |||
04 /
Richtár, Michal Sokolovská 1187 708 00 Ostrava 8 / CZ | Representative(s) | Kendereski, Dusan Koliste 13a 602 00 Brno / CZ | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14002169.2 | 24.06.2014 | [2015/04] | Priority number, date | CZ20130000485 | 24.06.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130485 | [2015/04] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827119 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2827119 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/007 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
G01M17/0074 (EP);
G01M17/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Adapter zur Stabilisierung von Motorräder auf Walzenprüfstellen | [2015/04] | English: | Adapter for fixation of motorcycles on roller test benches | [2015/04] | French: | Adapteur pour fixer la moto sur les rouleaux d'essai | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2014 | AL | 03.08.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.06.2014 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 24.06.2014 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.06.2014 | |
AL | 03.08.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1126530 (LABINAL ETS) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]FR1185994 (PIERRE LUQUIAU) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3837219 (CLAYTON W) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1 - column 13 ** figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0930493 (FUCHS DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1 - column 14 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2942039 (FUCHS DANIEL FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1 - page 10 * * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | US3733894 | US3940978 | US4196617 | WO9967618 | CZ291080 | EP1753639 |