EP2876275 - Reciprocating piston combustion engine and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prümm, Franz Werner Rehhofstraße 32 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14002466.2 | 16.07.2014 | [2015/22] | Priority number, date | DE20131019340 | 20.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013019340 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876275 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2876275 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02B21/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
F02B21/00 (EP,RU);
F02B29/06 (RU);
F02D17/026 (RU);
F02D41/0002 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine | [2015/22] | English: | Reciprocating piston combustion engine and method for operating same | [2015/22] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à piston élévateur et procédé de fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne à piston élévateur | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 05.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2014 | AL | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | MT | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2865769 (UNIV ORLEANS [FR]); | [XI]DE102004028216 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE102007001119 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE102007027968 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]); | [XI]EP2333271 (IVECO SPA [IT]); | Examination | DE4411934 | US2005182553 | by applicant | DE10129976 |