EP2980991 - Remote controller and system having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nashida, Tatsushi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Sawai, Kunihito c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14002579.2 | 04.07.2002 | [2016/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010211854 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001211854 | JP20010215188 | 16.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001215188 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2980991 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2980991 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980991 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03J1/00, H04N5/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/472, H04N21/436, H04N21/482, H04N21/4782, G06F3/0486 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H03J1/0025 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/42222 (EP,US);
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/42208 (US);
H04N21/42227 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | H03J1/00, H04N5/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/472, H04N21/436, H04N21/482, H04N21/4782 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/05] | Title | German: | Fernsteuerung und System damit | [2016/05] | English: | Remote controller and system having the same | [2016/05] | French: | Contrôleur à distance et système le comportant | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2014 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02014797.1 / EP1276237 | Divisional application(s) | EP18193886.1 / EP3462613 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 17   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6018340 (BUTLER LAURA J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 15 * * figures 11(a)-13(b) * * abstract *; | [Y]WO0059212 (ZILOG INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 30 * * page 18, line 2 - page 21, line 30 * * figures 1-13 *; | [A]US6160551 (NAUGHTON PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 5 ** figures 1A-24 * |