EP2991097 - Method and device for time-resolved pump-probe electron microscopy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarvari, Nahid Talebi Furtwänglerstrasse 97 70195 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/47] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
Talebi Sarvari, Nahid Furtwänglerstrasse 97 70195 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2016/09] | 01 /
Talebi Sarvari, Nahid Furtwänglerstr. 97 70195 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Hertz, Oliver v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14002946.3 | 25.08.2014 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991097 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2991097 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/22, H01J37/244, H01J37/26, G01N21/00, G01N23/00 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H01J37/228 (EP,US);
G01N23/2251 (EP,US);
H01J37/226 (EP,US);
H01J37/244 (EP,US);
H01J37/26 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2445 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur zeitaufgelösten Pump-Probe-Elektronenmikroskopie | [2016/09] | English: | Method and device for time-resolved pump-probe electron microscopy | [2016/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de microscopie à électrons par pompe-sonde à résolution temporelle | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 15.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2014 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.08.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 25.08.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.08.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.08.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012293791 (MILAS MIRKO [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0081] - [0094] *; | [A]US2013234023 (ZEWAIL AHMED H [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0210] - [0213] * * paragraphs [0183] , [0184] *; | [A] - DOHLER G ET AL, "RECENT OROTRON RESULTS", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING. WASHINGTON, DEC. 6 - 9, 1987; [INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19871206), vol. -, no. 1987, pages 303 - 306, XP000042536 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005098895 | - A. YURTSEVER ET AL., "Subparticle Ultrafast Spectrum Imaging in 4D Electron Microscopy", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 335, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1213504, pages 59 - 64, XP055071802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1213504 | - G. SCIAINI ET AL., "Femtosecond electron diffraction: heralding the era of atomically resolved dynamics", REPORTS ON PROGRESS IN PHYSICS, (2011), vol. 74, pages 096101 - 096137 | - P. BAUM, "On the physics of ultrashort single-electron pulses for time-resolved microscopy and diffraction", CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (2013), vol. 423, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chemphys.2013.06.012, pages 55 - 61, XP028710985 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemphys.2013.06.012 | - A. GAHLMANN ET AL., "Ultrashort electron pulses for diffraction, crystallography and microscopy: theoretical and experimental resolutions", PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (2008), vol. 10, pages 2894 - 2909 | - M. AIDELSBURGER ET AL., "Single-electron pulses for ultrafast diffraction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2010), vol. 107, pages 19714 - 19719 | - A. GLISERIN ET AL., "Compression of single-electron pulses with a microwave cavity", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (2012), vol. 14, page 073055 | - J. URATA ET AL., "Superradiant Smith-Purcell emission", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1998), vol. 80, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.80.516, pages 516 - 519, XP002277686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.80.516 | - G. DOUCAS ET AL., "lst Observation of Smith-Purcell Radiation from Relativistic Electrons", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1992), vol. 69, pages 1761 - 1764 | - A. GOVER ET AL., "A Unified Theory of Magnetic Bremsstrahlung, Electrostatic Bremsstrahlung, Compton-Raman Scattering, and Cerenkov-Smith-Purcell Free-Electron Lasers", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (1981), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1109/JQE.1981.1071257, pages 1196 - 1215, XP000705197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.1981.1071257 | - G. ADAMO ET AL., "Tuneable electron-beam-driven nanoscale light source", JOURNAL OF OPTICS, (2010), vol. 12, pages 024012 - 024017 | - G. ADAMO ET AL., "Electron-Beam-Driven Collective-Mode Metamaterial Light Source", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (2012), vol. 109, pages 0217401 - 0217406 | - I. A. WALMSLEY ET AL., "Characterization of ultrashort electromagnetic pulses", ADVANCES IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS, (2009), vol. 1, pages 308 - 437 | - G. ADAMO ET AL., "Light Well: A Tunable Free-Electron Light Source on a Chip", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (2009), vol. 103, pages 113901 - 113905 | - N. TALEBI ET AL., "Numerical simulations of interference effects in photon-assisted electron energy-loss spec troscopy", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (2013), vol. 15, pages 053013 - 053028 | EP20130001598 |