EP2845698 - Robot gripper for turning food portions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach Günther-Weber-Strasse 3 35236 Breidenbach / DE | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhmichel, Christoph Im Stillen Winkel 3 57319 Bad Berleburg / DE | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 14003121.2 | 09.09.2014 | [2015/11] | Priority number, date | DE20131015020 | 10.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013015020 | [2015/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845698 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25J11/00, B25J15/00 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
B25J11/0045 (EP);
B25J15/0004 (EP);
B25J15/0014 (EP);
B25J15/0052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2015/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Robotergreifer zum Wenden von Lebensmittelportionen | [2015/11] | English: | Robot gripper for turning food portions | [2015/11] | French: | Poignée de robot destinée à tourner des portions de produits alimentaires | [2015/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 28.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012044157 (BEHEERSMIJ G A CH M JENTJENS B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * figures 1,2,3a,3b,4a,4b * * page 4, line 16 - line 21 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 1 * * page 5, line 7 - line 13 * * page 6, line 24 - line 27 * * page 7, line 3 - line 7 *; | [X]DE20000525U (BAUMANN MASCHINENBAU SOLMS GMB [DE]) [X] 1-5,10 * abstract * * page 5, line 23 - line 31 *; | [XY]JP2009214194 (OKURA YUSOKI CO LTD) [X] 1-5,10 * abstract * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP0548545 (DIGITRON AG [CH]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [XY]SU870109 (DALNEVOSTOCH POLT INST [SU]) [X] 1-5,9,14 * figure .. * [Y] 11; | [Y]DE9213010U (SOMMER AUTOMATIC GMBH) [Y] 11 * figure . * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 8 *; | [A]DE202010010157U (WEBER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |