EP2873641 - C-yoke [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltronic A/S Kilde Alle 4 8722 Hedensted / DK | [2018/04] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states AH Industries A/S Industrivej 4 6760 Ribe / DK | ||
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states AH Industries A/S Gl. Skartved 9 6091 Bjert / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allan Leth, Frank Tvedvej 133, 4-401 6000 Kolding / DK | [2015/31] |
Former [2015/26] | 01 /
Allan Leth, Frank - - / DK | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Rottenberg, Annabell Simone Tropa ApS Aagade 97, 1st Floor 8370 Hadsten / DK | ||
Former [2015/21] | Nielsen, Charlotte Tropa ApS Aagade 97 8370 Hadsten / DK | Application number, filing date | 14003526.2 | 15.10.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | DK20130000647 | 15.11.2013 Original published format: DK 201300647 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873641 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873641 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/62, F03D1/00, B66C1/10 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
B66C1/62 (EP,CN);
B66C1/108 (EP,CN);
F03D13/10 (CN);
F03D13/40 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B66C1/10, B66C1/62, F03D11/04, F03D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | C-Bügel | [2015/21] | English: | C-yoke | [2015/21] | French: | C-joug | [2016/35] |
Former [2015/21] | Étrier en C | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
09.03.2018
WITHDRAWN Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
09.03.2018
WITHDRAWN Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2017/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2017
WITHDRAWN Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 04.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.08.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/02] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 21.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2014 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | IE | 15.10.2017 | LU | 15.10.2017 | MT | 15.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/33] | AL | 22.02.2017 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
IS | 22.06.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03100249 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010124744 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,10* abstract *; | [XAI]JP2010265752 (NITTSU SHOJI KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3 [I] 5-8,10; | [XI]EP2345811 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-7,12 | Opposition | WO03100249 | WO2010124744 | JP2010265752 | EP2345811 | WO2012095112 | WO2013091632 | - "Rubber - Determination of frictional properties", International Standard ISO 15113:2005(E), (20051015), XP055441304 | - "Assistance with selection of rubbers", DANISH TECHNOLOGICAL INSTITUTE Test Report, (20171013), XP055441311 |