EP2888947 - Refiner / mixer for products for the food industry, for the pharmaceutical industry, and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/27] | REFINER / MIXER FOR PRODUCTS FOR THE FOOD INDUSTRY, FOR THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY, AND THE LIKE | ||
[2016/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taricco e Gallo s.n.c. Strada prov.le n. 661 Localita Piano 1 m 12060 Novello (CN) / IT | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallo, Gianni Strada prov.le n. 661 - Località Piano 1 m 12060 Novello (CN) / IT | 02 /
Taricco, Franco Strada prov.le n. 661 - Località Piano 1 m 12060 Novello (CN) / IT | 03 /
Giraudo, Vittore Via del Passatore, 224 - Fraz. Passatore 12100 Cuneo (CN) / IT | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 14004248.2 | 17.12.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | IT2013CN00014 | 31.12.2013 Original published format: IT CN20130014 | [2015/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888947 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/12, B02C4/04, B02C15/12, B02C25/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
A23G1/12 (EP);
B02C15/007 (EP);
B02C17/04 (EP);
B02C4/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2015/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Refiner/Mischer für Produkte für die Lebensmittelindustrie, für die pharmazeutische Industrie und dergleichen | [2016/32] | English: | Refiner / mixer for products for the food industry, for the pharmaceutical industry, and the like | [2016/32] | French: | Raffineur / malaxeur pour des produits des industries alimentairs, pharmaceutiques et similaires | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/27] | REFINER/MISCHER FÜR PRODUKTE FÜR DIE LEBENSMITTELINDUSTRIE, FÜR DIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE INDUSTRIE UND DERGLEICHEN | ||
Former [2015/27] | REFINER / MIXER FOR PRODUCTS FOR THE FOOD INDUSTRY, FOR THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY, AND THE LIKE | ||
Former [2015/27] | RAFFINEUR / MALAXEUR POUR DES PRODUITS DES INDUSTRIES ALIMENTAIRS, PHARMACEUTIQUES ET SIMILAIRES | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 28.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/48] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2015C dated 23/03/2017) | Taricco e Gallo s.n.c. Strada prov.le n. 661 Localita Piano 1 m 12060 Novello (CN) / IT | [2017/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2011013157 (MASANTE MARIO [IT]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19931181 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [AD] 1-10 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 41; figure -; claims 1,8,9,17,18,19 *; | [A]EP0163890 (CARLE & MONTANARI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 1; figure 1 * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 12 - page 10, line 27 *; | [A]WO2007121596 (BUEHLER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12, paragraph 1 - paragraph l * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph l *; | [A]WO02097541 (BUEHLER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1043070 (KRAFT JACOBS SUCHARD R & D INC [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE2539153 (BUEHLER MIAG GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2011121429 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 13; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE1228896 (WALTER BALTZER) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | ITTO20090571 | DE1228896 | DE19931181 |