EP2759737 - Device for absorbing the vibrations originating from a pump or a pumping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dab Pumps S.p.A. Via Marco Polo, 14 35035 Mestrino (Padova) / IT | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sinico, Francesco Via Circonvallazione, 61 36075 MONTECCHIO MAGGIORE VI / IT | 02 /
Iacoponi, Alessandro Via Spadolini, 1 56021 CASCINA, Fraz. S. Lorenzo a Pagnatico PI / IT | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14150787.1 | 10.01.2014 | [2014/31] | Priority number, date | IT2013PD00011 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: IT PD20130011 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759737 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/08 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
F16F15/085 (EP);
F04D29/605 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme der Schwingungen aus einer Pumpe oder einer Pumpenvorrichtung | [2014/31] | English: | Device for absorbing the vibrations originating from a pump or a pumping device | [2014/31] | French: | Dispositif pour absorber les vibrations provenant d'une pompe ou d'un dispositif de pompage | [2014/31] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 31.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2307567 (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XI]JPH01182644 (CUBIC ENG KK) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [I] 5; | [X]EP0849489 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007262213 (DE TOLEDO CARLOS EDUARDO BURAT [BR], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XI]JP2008086609 (ISHIGURO MFG) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [I] 5,6; | [X]WO2008139795 (RINNAI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2033829 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102009044005 (CONTITECH LUFTFEDERSYST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2012015032 (TOKKYOKIKI CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [A] 6[I] 5 |