EP2784438 - Method for generating two-dimensional images from three-dimensional optical coherence tomography interferogram data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho 174-8580 Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reisman, Charles A. 329 Stanley Avenue Mamaroneck, NY, 10543 / US | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2014/40] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14150879.6 | 13.01.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | US201313851612 | 27.03.2013 Original published format: US201313851612 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784438 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2784438 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, A61B3/107 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/02044 (EP,US);
G01B9/02083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von zweidimensionalen Bildern aus dreidimensionalen optischen Kohärenztomographie-Interferogrammdaten | [2014/40] | English: | Method for generating two-dimensional images from three-dimensional optical coherence tomography interferogram data | [2014/40] | French: | Procédé pour produire des images bidimensionnelles à partir des données d'interférogramme à tomographie par cohérence optique tridimensionnelle | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2014 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | IE | 13.01.2019 | LU | 13.01.2019 | MT | 13.01.2019 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GB | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 13.01.2014 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008100612 (DASTMALCHI SHAHRAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2011032479 (UTSUNOMIYA NORIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US8319974 (KNIGHTON ROBERT W [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4, line 12 - column 8, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - BIEDERMANN B R ET AL, "Real time en face Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography with direct hardware frequency demodulation", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (20081101), vol. 33, no. 21, doi:10.1364/OL.33.002556, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 2556 - 2558, XP001519571 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.33.002556 |