EP2767965 - Apparatus for providing drive assist information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saka, Tasuku c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/34] | 01 /
Saka, Tasuku Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/34] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14151083.4 | 14.01.2014 | [2014/34] | Priority number, date | JP20130025701 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013025701 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2767965 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2767965 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767965 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0962, G08G1/0967 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
G08G1/09626 (EP,US);
G08G1/096855 (US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (EP,US);
G08G1/09 (EP,US);
G08G1/093 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G06V20/588, G06V20/56 (US);
G08G1/09, G08G1/093 (US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Fahrassistenzinformationen | [2014/34] | English: | Apparatus for providing drive assist information | [2014/34] | French: | Appareil permettant de fournir des informations d'assistance d'entraînement | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 05.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2014 | AL | 18.05.2016 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IS | 18.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | IE | 14.01.2017 | LU | 14.01.2017 | MT | 14.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.05.2016 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
MT | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0005091 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 3 *; | [IA]US2012280835 (RAZ OFER NISSIM [IL], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0096] * [A] 3,5; | [XP]DE102012200182 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XP] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | JP3293508B |