EP2757051 - Cup with drink-through lid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innoprax AG Hofmattweg 1 6045 Meggen / CH | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kienle, Erich Weidhofstrasse 8 6044 Udligenswil / CH | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2014/30] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14151399.4 | 16.01.2014 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | CH20130000247 | 21.01.2013 Original published format: CH 2472013 | [2014/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757051 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757051 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D51/18, B65D51/28, A47G19/22 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
B65D43/0277 (EP);
B65D43/0281 (EP);
B65D43/0283 (EP);
B65D51/185 (EP);
B65D51/28 (EP);
B65D55/024 (EP);
B65D2205/025 (EP);
B65D2401/25 (EP);
B65D2543/00046 (EP);
B65D2543/00092 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00351 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2014/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Becher mit Trinkdeckel | [2014/30] | English: | Cup with drink-through lid | [2014/30] | French: | Gobelet muni d'un couvercle pour boire | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2014 | AL | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | IE | 16.01.2018 | LU | 16.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.01.2014 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 16.01.2014 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012125949 (FREEMAN GLEN D [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003192891 (ZIEGLER SCOTT W [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2009223981 (LEVEY WILLIAM M [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9418851U (H & K MUELLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 4-8 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO2004096657 (AUTOBAR GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 11-14 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 10 * [A] 1-10; | [A]US2012024473 (STEWART PIERRE [CA]) [A] 1-3,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010301109 (LEWIS FRED [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5692616 (BAKER DENNIS [US]) [A] 1-3,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005077780 (KOFFIEBRANDERIJ EN THEEHANDEL [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009065518 (CARNEVALI JEFFREY D [US]) [A] 1-3,9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0119] *; | [A]US4503992 (SITKO JERRY A [CA], et al) [A] 1,9,14 * the whole document * * s. insbesondere Spalte 3, Zeilen 43 bis 66 *; | [A]US5108003 (GRANOFSKY BARRY P [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]FR2847556 (VAHEDI ARNAUD [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2478031 (SCHEIDEGGER ALBERT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4927048 (HOWARD ROY T [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 22 *; | [A]US5119955 (GRANOFSKY BARRY P [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009132318 (SEANET DEV INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * Alternative Deckel-Befestigung Schnappen oder Schrauben; paragraph [0004] *; | [A]WO2010116223 (NOVACART SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * Stopfenartiger Deckel mit Außengewinde *; | [A]WO2004000675 (HK PLASTICS B V [NL], et al) [A] 4-8 * abstract *; | [A]US5711447 (PLESTER GEORGE [BE]) [A] 4-8 * abstract *; | [A]US4967920 (DAHL RANDAL A [US]) [A] 4-8 * abstract * | by applicant | US2012292317 | US2004104503 |