EP2757459 - Apparatus and method for an adaptive edge-to-edge display system for multi-touch devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xia, Zhiping 21454 Shannon Ct Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 02 /
Lee, Howard Z. 1110 Wilmington Ave San Jose, CA California 95129 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14151503.1 | 16.01.2014 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | US201313743029 | 16.01.2013 Original published format: US201313743029 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757459 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/041 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für ein adaptives randloses Anzeigesystem für Mehrfachberührungsvorrichtungen | [2014/30] | English: | Apparatus and method for an adaptive edge-to-edge display system for multi-touch devices | [2014/30] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour système d'affichage de bord-à-bord adaptatif pour dispositifs tactiles multiples | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | 09.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012038571 (SUSANI MARCO [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 *; | [X]US2010103098 (GEAR GAVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 *; | [X]EP2175344 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5,7,8,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0108] * * figures 1A, 1B, 6A, 6B, 7A, 7B, 8, 12A-14b *; | [X]US2009184935 (KIM JI-SANG [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 3, 4, 5, 6A, 6B, 6C *; | [X]US2011316807 (CORRION BRADLEY [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 * |