EP2764813 - Mobile robot mopping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egenpower Inc. 32151 E. Nine Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Yao-Hsi 6655 Linden Ave., Burnaby Vancouver, B.C., British Columbia / CA | 02 /
Zhu, Fei-Yun 3F, Building C, No. 21, Nanling Rd., Xiner Community, Shajing Town Shenzhen City / CN | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14152257.3 | 23.01.2014 | [2014/33] | Priority number, date | TW20130105306 | 08.02.2013 Original published format: TW 102105306 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2764813 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2764813 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A47L11/28 (EP,US);
A47L9/28 (KR);
A47L11/24 (KR);
A47L11/4002 (EP,US);
A47L11/4038 (EP,US);
A47L11/4061 (US);
A47L11/4066 (EP,US);
A47L11/408 (US);
A47L11/4083 (US);
A47L9/00 (KR);
B25J13/08 (KR);
A47L2201/00 (US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobile Roboterwischmaschine | [2014/33] | English: | Mobile robot mopping machine | [2014/33] | French: | Machine de nettoyage robotique mobile | [2014/33] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP17157125.0 / EP3192423 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004082899 (SHARPER IMAGE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 7, lines 15-24 ** page 19, lines 27-28 *; | [X]US7346428 (HUFFMAN ERIC C [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, lines 23-39 * * column 4, lines 3-14 *; | [X]WO2009132317 (EVOLUTION ROBOTICS [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 13, paragraph 4 * * page 20, paragraph 3 *; | [X]US2013025085 (KIM SIYONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0065] , [0075] , [0087] * | by applicant | TWM394793U | TWI345961B | TWM427121U | TWM436438U |