EP2759224 - Hair straightener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altmann, Berthold Oderbergerstraße 9 83374 Oderberg / DE | 02 /
Blischke, Daniela Nordring 2 83349 Palling / DE | 03 /
Copitzky, Thomas Leonrodstraße 5 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2014/31] | Application number, filing date | 14152263.1 | 23.01.2014 | [2014/31] | Priority number, date | DE201310201105 | 24.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013201105 | [2014/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759224 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2759224 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D1/04, A45D2/00 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP);
A45D2/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2014/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Haarglätter | [2014/31] | English: | Hair straightener | [2014/31] | French: | Fer à lisser | [2014/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 28.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2014 | AL | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | MT | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | IE | 23.01.2016 | LU | 23.01.2016 | BE | 31.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/39] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009015803 (BRAUN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2 - page 4; figure - ** page 9 *; | [A]EP2371233 (ROVCAL INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0022] - [0028] - [0049] - [0050]; figure - *; | [A]DE102011078562 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figure - * |