EP2899027 - Controlling a print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HP Scitex Ltd 8B Hatzoran Street Netanya Industrial Park 42506 Netanya / IL | [2017/52] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Industrial Printing Ltd. 8b Hatzoran Street 42506 Netanya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edlitz, Yochai 8b Hatzoran St. P.O. Box 8743 New Industrial Area 42505 Netanya / IL | 02 /
Bavli, Dan 8b Hatzoran St. P.O. Box 8743 New Industrial Area 42505 Netanya / IL | 03 /
Indorsky, Dennis 8b Hatzoran St. P.O. Box 8743 New Industrial Area 42505 Netanya / IL | 04 /
Eliasaf, Ehud 8b Hatzoran St. P.O. Box 8743 New Industrial Area 42505 Netanya / IL | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14152737.4 | 27.01.2014 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899027 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/04525 (EP,US);
B41J2/165 (US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04595 (EP,US);
B41J2/04596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2015/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuerung eines Druckkopfes | [2015/31] | English: | Controlling a print head | [2015/31] | French: | Commander une tête d'impression | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 12.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5862063 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,10,15 * abstract *; | [X]WO9525011 (XAAR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5-10,12,14,15 * page 19, line 5 - line 13 *; | [X]US2005035986 (IWAO NAOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,15* paragraph [0165]; figure 11c *; | [X]US2010265290 (FURUHATA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063]; figures 7a,7b *; | [X]US2012081430 (MATSUO HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14 * paragraph [0059]; figure 9a * |