EP2763038 - Method and apparatus for processing multimedia content on a graphic cloud [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Srivastava, Amar 8th Floor Tower A Logix Cyber India Park C28-29 Sector 62 Noida UP 201301 India / IN | 02 /
Srivastava, Hemanshu 8th Floor Tower A Logix Cyber India Park C28-29 Sector 62 Noida UP 201301 India / IN | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14152901.6 | 28.01.2014 | [2014/32] | Priority number, date | IN2013CHE0443 | 01.02.2013 Original published format: IN CH04432013 | KR20140006025 | 17.01.2014 Original published format: KR 20140006025 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2763038 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2763038 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (US);
G06T1/20 (US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Basisstationsvorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Multimediainhalt auf einer Grafik-Cloud | [2014/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for processing multimedia content on a graphic cloud | [2014/32] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement de contenu multimédia sur un nuage graphique | [2014/32] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 30.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006146057 (BLYTHE DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] ** paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0092] *; | [A]US2012131178 (ZHU WENWU [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1, 6, 8, 9 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] *; | [XI]US2012254439 (YAMASAKI KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13,14 * figures 2, 3, 5 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0261] * [I] 3,4,6,9,10,12; | [A] - VIGNESH T RAVI ET AL, "Supporting GPU sharing in cloud environments with a transparent runtime consolidation framework", 20TH ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HIGH-PERFORMANCE PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, HPDC'11, (20110611), doi:10.1145/1996130.1996160, ISBN 978-1-45-030552-5, pages 217 - 228, XP055040715 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1996130.1996160 |