EP2775500 - Switching assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, Henry Eigenheimstr. 2 37574 Einbeck / DE | 02 /
Rohs, Markus Berliner Str. 63 32825 Blomberg / DE | 03 /
Pott, Thomas Ehlentruper Weg 72 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
Eilers, Markus Göslingstraße 19 31812 Bad Pyrmont / DE | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstaße 65 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/37] | Klinski, Robert Patentship Patentanwaltskanzlei Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14153170.7 | 30.01.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | DE201310102096 | 04.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013102096 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775500 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2775500 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/32, H02H1/06 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H01H47/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2014/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung | [2014/37] | English: | Switching assembly | [2014/37] | French: | Circuit | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 20.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2014 | AL | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | MT | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB190903192 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 12 * * figure Fig. 1 * [Y] 3-10; | [Y]US5055962 (PETERSON GREGORY A [US], et al) [Y] 3-10 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 2 * * figure 2 * |