EP2767224 - A method for the detection of subcutaneous cardiac signals and a cardiac device for use in detecting subcutaneous cardiac signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moulder, J. Christopher 3420 SE Martins St. Portland, OR Oregon 97202 / US | 02 /
de Voir, Christopher S. 13414 SW Hillshire Drive Tigard, OR Oregon 97223 / US | 03 /
Whittington, R. Hollis 7631 SE 11th Ave. Portland, OR Oregon 97202 / US | 04 /
Garner, Garth 12365 SW Thornwood Drive Tigard, OR Oregon 97224 / US | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus, et al Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Galander, Marcus, et al Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2014/34] | Lamprecht, Frank Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14153174.9 | 30.01.2014 | [2014/34] | Priority number, date | US201361766137P | 19.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361766137 P | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767224 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767224 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0472, A61N1/36 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2014/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für den Nachweis von subkutanen Herzsignalen und Herzvorrichtung zum Nachweis von subkutanen Herzsignalen | [2014/34] | English: | A method for the detection of subcutaneous cardiac signals and a cardiac device for use in detecting subcutaneous cardiac signals | [2014/34] | French: | Procédé pour la détection de signaux cardiaques sous-cutanés et dispositif cardiaque sous-cutané destiné à être utilisé dans la détection de signaux cardiaques | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2014 | AL | 01.03.2017 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4458692 (SIMSON MICHAEL [US]) [I] 1-3,13-15 * column 2, lines 5-40 * * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 66 *; | [A]US5967994 (WANG JYH-YUN J [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, lines 36-55 * |