EP2903250 - Image recording method with adaptive marking light emission and corresponding image recording device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WolfVision GmbH Oberes Ried 14 6833 Klaus / AT | [2017/01] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states WolfVision Innovation GmbH Oberes Ried 14 6833 Klaus / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kresser, Clemens Am Mühlbach 13 6912 Hörbranz / AT | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Holzheu, Christian Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 14153489.1 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903250 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/195, G03B21/10, H04N1/38 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/195 (EP,US);
H04N23/74 (US);
G03B17/54 (EP,US);
H04N1/38 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (US);
H04N2201/0436 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0452 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmeverfahren mit adaptiver Markierlichtemission und ebensolches Bildaufnahmegerät | [2015/32] | English: | Image recording method with adaptive marking light emission and corresponding image recording device | [2015/32] | French: | Procédé de prise de vue avec émission de lumière de marquage adaptative et appareil de prise de vue correspondant | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5194729 (OKISU NORIYUKI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]DE202008012677U (WOLFVISION INNOVATION GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,11 * abstract * [I] 2-10,12-15; | [A]WO2012109997 (SUNWELL CONCEPT LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | EP0362737 | DE10204660 | CH698323 |