EP2838011 - Printing control method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2019/50] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states HP Printing Korea Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states S-Printing Solution Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Woo-chul 112-404, 460, Yangsan-ro, Osan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung-wan 6104-601, 76, Central town-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Jun-young 201-701, 82, Maetan-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Hee-jung 114-1301, 23, Cheonggu-ro 1-gil, Jung-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14153496.6 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/08] | Priority number, date | KR20130096506 | 14.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130096506 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2838011 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2838011 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0484 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/1205 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/1253 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/0484 (KR,US);
G06F3/1208 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/1255 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/1257 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2015/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drucksteuervorrichtung und -verfahren | [2015/08] | English: | Printing control method and apparatus | [2015/08] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle d'impression | [2015/08] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2020 | 16.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 09.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009310171 (ONODA YUKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0137] ** figures 9, 10, 12, 13, 17, 19 *; | [A]EP2161913 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 3-7 *; | [XI]US2012236361 (TAKEI NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0098] * * figures 1-3, 4A, 4B * [I] 7,8 |