EP2764866 - Inhibitors of nedd8-activating enzyme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IP Gesellschaft für Management mbH Krieler Strasse 113 50931 Köln / DE | [2014/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trinius, Frank IP Gesellschaft für Management mbH Krielerstr. 113 50931 Köln / DE | [2014/33] | Application number, filing date | 14153732.4 | 04.02.2014 | [2014/33] | Priority number, date | EP20130154479 | 07.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13154479 | EP20130154497 | 07.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13154497 | EP20130155308 | 14.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13155308 | EP20130157312 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13157312 | EP20130157322 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: EP 13157322 | EP20130158148 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13158148 | EP20130158123 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13158123 | EP20130160513 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13160513 | EP20130160508 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13160508 | EP20130160501 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13160501 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764866 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, C07D239/46, A61P35/00 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61K31/498 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hemmer der nedd8-aktivierenden Enzyme | [2014/33] | English: | Inhibitors of nedd8-activating enzyme | [2014/33] | French: | Inhibiteurs de l'enzyme activant nedd8 | [2014/33] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008019124 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 49; compounds I-115 * * page 81, lines 1-2 * * paragraph [0151] * * pages 182-183; example 137 * * claim - *; | [I]US2008051404 (CLAIBORNE CHRISTOPHER F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 46; compounds I-115 * * paragraph [0379] * * paragraph [0391] * * page 124; example 137 * * claim - *; | [XDP]WO2013028832 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [XDP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0076] * * claim - *; | [XP]WO2013067396 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * claim - * | by applicant | WO2013018362 | WO2013017989 | WO2013021309 | WO2013028465 | WO2013028832 | WO2013030374 | WO2013030803 | WO2013040120 | WO2013039764 | WO2013038351 | WO2007010356 | WO2008010853 | WO2008010356 | WO2010001156 | WO2006102087 | WO0230904 | WO2008140449 | WO2008141176 | WO2012080497 | WO2012037782 | WO2012075917 | WO2012076435 | US2008279846 | US2010239565 | US2008280829 | WO2010015613 | US2010129363 | US2010168475 | US6281230 | US5635517 | US2004220144 | US2004190609 | US2004087546 | US2005203142 | US2004091455 | US2005100529 | US2005214328 | US2005239842 | US2006154880 | US2006122228 | US2005143344 | US6225348 | US6218369 | US6015803 | US6001368 | US5770589 | US5632984 | US5800819 | US2004029832 | WO2004103274 | US2006030594 | US2002054899 | US2005222209 | US2005143420 | WO2010093588 | WO9803502 | WO9854170 | US2007048327 | US6605617 | US6774237 | US7335774 | US7470709 | WO2006127926 | WO2009115562 | - GOODMAN C ET AL., HEALTH POLICY PLAN., (200711), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 393 - 403 | - SOW PS ET AL., INT J INFECT DIS., (200206), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 108 - 12 | - GU ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 1, page E15640 | - T. W. GREENE; P. WUTZ, PROTECTIVE GROUPS IN ORGANIC SYNTHESIS | - GREENE, T. W.; WUTS, P. G. M., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis(3 ed.),, WILEY-LNTERSCIENCE, (1999), page 266 | - FURNISS, B. S.; HANNAFORD, A. J.; SMITH, P. W. G.; TATCHELL, A. R., Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry, LONGMAN, (1989), page 1052 | - CARROLL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 1 1979 - 1 1984 | - MAO ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2008), vol. 373, pages 1 - 8 | - GALLINARI ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 38, pages 5620 - 32 | - P. GALLINARI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 6758 - 69 | - M. TALIANI ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 240, pages 60 - 67 | - MAO ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 373, pages 1 - 8 | - SHIRAKAWA ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2004), vol. 77, pages 1814 - 1820 | - PURI V.; DANTULURI A.K.; BANSAL A.K, "Investigation of Atypical Dissolution Behavior of an Encapsulated Amorphous Solid Dispersion", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2011), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 2460 - 8 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, 2d. Ed.,, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - K.D. HARRIS, "Powder diffraction crystallography of molecular solids", TOP CURR CHEM., (2012), vol. 315, pages 133 - 77 | - N. CHIENG; T. RADES; J.AALTONEN, "An overview of recent studies on the analysis of pharmaceutical polymorphs", J PHARM BIOMED ANAL., (2011), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 618 - 44 | - H.G. BRITTAIN; S.J. BODANOWICH; D.E. BUGAY; J. DEVONCENTIS; G. LEWEN, A.W., "Newman, Physical characterization of pharmaceutical solids", PHARM RES., (1991), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 963 - 73 | - D.E. BUGAY, "Characterization of the solid-state: spoectroscopic techniques", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (2001), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 43 - 65 | - P.A. TISHMACK; D.E. BUGAY; S.R. BYM, "Solid-state nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy - pharmaceutical application", J PHARM SCI, (2003), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 441 - 74 | - C.J. LEE; C.J. STRACHAN; P.J. MANSON; T. RADES, "Characterization of the bulk properties of pharmaceutical solids using nonlinear optics - a review", J PHARM PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 241 - 50 | - FELL, J.T.; NEWTON, J.M., "Determination of tablet strength by diametral compression test", J. PHARM. SCI., (1970), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600590523, pages 688 - 691, XP009148046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600590523 | - NYSTROM, C.; MALMQVIST, K.; MAZUR, J.; ALEX, W.; HOLZER, A.W., "Measurement of axial and radial tensile strength of tablets and their relation to capping", ACTA PHARM. SUEC., (1978), vol. 15, pages 226 - 232 | - STANLEY-WOOD, N.G.; JOHANSSON, M.E., "Variation of intra- and inter-particle porosity with degree of compaction", ANALYST, (1980), vol. 105, pages 1104 - 1112 | - WESTERMARCK, S.; JUPPO, A.M.; KERVINEN, L.; YLIRUUSI, J., "Pore structure and surface area of mannitol powder, granules and tablets determined with mercury porosimetry and nitrogen adsorption", EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (1998), vol. 46, pages 61 - 86 | - JUPPO, A.M., "Relationship between breaking force and pore structure of lactose, glucose and mannitol tablets", INT. J. PHARM., (1996), vol. 127, pages 95 - 102 | - N. RASENACK; B.W. MÜLLER, "Micron-size drug particles: common and novel micronization techniques", PHARM DEV TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1081/PDT-120027417, pages 1 - 13, XP009055393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/PDT-120027417 | - A. MARTIN; M.J. COCERO, "Micronization processes with supercritical fluids: fundamentals and mechanisms", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (2008), vol. 60, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2007.06.019, pages 339 - 50, XP022476828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.06.019 | US20040631870 | US20050289723 | US20040982757 | US20030706328 | US20060915005 |