EP2782131 - Power semiconductor module and assembly using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Jürgen Schützenstraße 21 90513 Zirndorf / DE | 02 /
Tursky, Werner Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 17 92224 Amberg / DE | [2014/39] | Application number, filing date | 14154241.5 | 07.02.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | DE201310102829 | 20.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013102829 | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2782131 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2782131 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/053, H01L23/00, H01L23/10, H01L23/24, H01L23/48 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H01L23/053 (EP);
H01L23/10 (EP);
H01L23/24 (EP);
H01L23/48 (EP);
H01L2224/4846 (EP);
H01L2224/48472 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | H01L23/053, H01L23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leistungshalbleitermodul und Anordnung hiermit | [2014/39] | English: | Power semiconductor module and assembly using the same | [2014/39] | French: | Module semi-conducteur de puissance et agencement doté de celui-ci | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 29.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5747875 (OSHIMA SEIICHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * figures 1, 3, 7, 9 * * column 3, lines 65-66 * * column 11, line 14 - column 14, line 4 * * column 14, lines 15-31 * [I] 4,7; | [I]US2010127371 (TSCHIRBS ROMAN [DE]) [I] 1-9 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0055] *; | [I]US2012106086 (SCHLOERKE RALF [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 27] - [0044] *; | [A]US4514587 (VAN DYK SOEREWYN HERMAN F [US]) [A] 4 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 6 * | by applicant | DE10132169 | DE102005055713 | DE102010038723 |