EP2900041 - DALI Short Address Conflict Detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerard Lighting Pty Ltd 142-144 Fullarton Road 5067 Rose Park South Australia / AU | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haskins, Clive c/o Gerard Lighting Pty Ltd 142-144 Fullarton Rd Rose Park, South Australia 5067 / AU | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 14154801.6 | 12.02.2014 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | AU20140200439 | 28.01.2014 Original published format: AU 2014200439 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2900041 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2900041 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
H05B47/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dali-Kurzadressenkonflikterkennung | [2015/31] | English: | DALI Short Address Conflict Detection | [2015/31] | French: | Détection de conflit d'adresse courte DALI | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004217718 (KUMAR RUSSIKESH [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0055] *; | [A]WO2013126965 (GERARD LIGHTING PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033] *; | [A]AU2013101529 (GERARD LIGHTING PTY LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0031] *; | [A]WO2011064694 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 23 - page 5, line 30 *; | [A]US2014016544 (CHAN MAN-CHI [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] * |