EP2774562 - Dynamic external fixator and methods for use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Trauma SA Bohnackerweg 1 2545 Selzach / CH | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crozet, Yves 76 Oak Ridge Road Ramsey, NJ New Jersey 07446 / US | 02 /
Gurvinderjit Singh, Walia C1A-3A, Janakpuri 110058 New Delhi / IN | 03 /
Singh, Manoj Kumar 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ New Jersey 07430 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14154811.5 | 12.02.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | US201313788466 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: US201313788466 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774562 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/6441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dynamischer externer Fixateur und Verwendungsverfahren | [2014/37] | English: | Dynamic external fixator and methods for use | [2014/37] | French: | Fixateur externe dynamique et procédés d'utilisation | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 11.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011082458 (CROZET YVES STEPHANE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] - [0037] - [0039] - [0042] - [0047] - [0049] - [0056]; figures 1a,1b,2a,2c,3a3c,3d,4,5,6a,6b,7a7b,8a,8b,9-13 * [A] 10-14,16-18 [I] 7-9; | [XAI]GB2250682 (LIU WEISHENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 2-8,10, * * page 6, line 14 - page 11, line 28 * [A] 6-18 [I] 5; | [A]US7422593 (CRESINA JEFFERY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,2,3,3a-3c,8,8a-8d,10,10a,10b,11,11a,11b, * * figures 12,12a,12b,13,13a,13b,14,14a,14b * * column 2, lines 40-60 * * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 20 * | by applicant | US20080157612 |