EP2732817 - A compound for use in treating injury associated with exposure to phosgene or chlorine gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Jewish Health 1400 Jackson Street Denver, CO 80206 / US | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Day, Brian J. 1400 Jackson Street Denver, CO 80206 / US | 02 /
White, Carl W. 1400 Jackson Street Denver, CO 80206 / US | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2014/21] | HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14154916.2 | 26.05.2009 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | US20080055919P | 23.05.2008 Original published format: US 55919 P | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732817 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732817 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/409, A61K31/4178, A61K31/427, A61K31/555, A61K45/06, A61P11/00, A61P17/00, A61P39/00 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/409 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/409, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/427, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindung zur Verwendung bei der Behandlung von Verletzungen aufgrund der Exposition gegenüber Phosgen oder Chlorgas | [2014/21] | English: | A compound for use in treating injury associated with exposure to phosgene or chlorine gas | [2014/21] | French: | Composé destiné à être utilisé dans le traitement d'une lésion associée à l'exposition à du phosgène ou du chlore gazeux | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09805313.5 / EP2300003 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2009 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | HR | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | HR | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | LT | 24.08.2016 | |
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO0043395 (NAT JEWISH MED & RES CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,9-12 * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * claims 1, 2, 11, 17-19 * * figure 1C * [A] 2,8; | [A]WO02060383 (NAT JEWISH MED & RES CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 2 - page 20, paragraph 2 * * page 21, paragraph 1 * * claims 11, 15-19 * * figures 1A-H, 9 *; | [A]WO02078670 (NEURON THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, lines 11-20 * * page 4, line 14 * * page 6; table par. 1 * * claims 1, 16 *; | [T]WO2011028935 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al) [T] 1-12 * page 14, paragraph [0053] - page 15 * * page 18, paragraph [0066] * * page 19, paragraph [0070] - page 21, paragraph [0072] * * page 25, paragraph [0083] - page 26 * * page 28, paragraph [0092] * * claims 1, 11, 14-17 * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - AKDUR OKHAN ET AL, "Experimental Inhalation of Chlorine Gas Produced with a Different Method; Effects of N-Acetyl Cysteine on Acute Pulmonary Damage", TOXICOLOGY MECHANISMS AND METHODS, (20080101), vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 1537-6524, pages 739 - 743, XP008168162 [Y] 1,3-7,9-12 * abstract * * page 739, paragraph l - page 740, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 742, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 742, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 743, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15376510802354912 | [A] - QIN XU-JUN ET AL, "[Effect of acute phosgene inhalation on antioxidant enzymes, nitric oxide and nitric-oxide synthase in rats].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200406), Database accession no. NLM15256156, XP002721669 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [ ] - QIN XU-JUN ET AL, "[Effect of acute phosgene inhalation on antioxidant enzymes, nitric oxide and nitric-oxide synthase in rats].", ZHONGHUA LAO DONG WEI SHENG ZHI YE BING ZA ZHI = ZHONGHUA LAODONG WEISHENG ZHIYEBING ZAZHI = CHINESE JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL HYGIENE AND OCCUPATIONAL DISEASES JUN 2004, (200406), vol. 22, no. 3, ISSN 1001-9391, pages 200 - 202 | [AP] - GOULD NEAL S ET AL, "A Role for Mitochondrial Oxidative Stress in Sulfur Mustard Analog 2-Chloroethyl Ethyl Sulfide-Induced Lung Cell Injury and Antioxidant Protection", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (200903), vol. 328, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 732 - 739 URL, XP002669844 [AP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 733, column 1, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 735, column 2, paragraph 4 * * figure 4 * * page 737, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 739, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/JPET.108.145037 | [AP] - O'NEILL HEIDI C ET AL, "Catalytic Antioxidant AEOL 10150 Ameliorates 2-Chloroethyl Ethyl Sulfide (CEES)-Induced Lung Injury in Rats", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, & 15TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY-FOR-FREE-RADICAL-BIOLOGY-AND-MEDI CINE; INDIANAPOLIS, IN, USA; NOVEMBER 19 -23, 2008, (2008), vol. 45, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0891-5849, page S89, XP002669845 [AP] 1-12 * the whole document * | [T] - TOBY MCGOVERN ET AL, "AEOL10150: A novel therapeutic for rescue treatment after toxic gas lung injury", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, US, vol. 50, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.FREERADBIOMED.2010.12.001, ISSN 0891-5849, (20101213), pages 602 - 608, (20101213), XP028133805 [T] 1-12 * abstract * * page 608, column 1, paragraphs 4-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.freeradbiomed.2010.12.001 | by applicant | US4861760 | US4911920 | US5212162 | US5403841 | WO9605309 | US7189707 | US2007149498 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", JOURNAL OFPHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - ALFONSO R. GENNARO, Pharmaceutical Sciences 17th Ed.,, MACK PUB. CO. |