EP2907625 - Hand-held tool with an alignment aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Iwan Quadergasse 9 7204 Untervaz / CH | 02 /
Bertsch, Klaus Mariagrünerstrasse 14 6820 Frastanz / AT | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 14155195.2 | 14.02.2014 | [2015/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907625 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, B25H1/00 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
B25F5/021 (EP);
B25C1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Handgeführtes Werkzeug mit einer Ausrichthilfe | [2015/34] | English: | Hand-held tool with an alignment aid | [2015/34] | French: | Outil manuel doté d'une aide à l'orientation | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2489475 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3-6,10,13,14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-11 * [A] 2,7-9,11,12,15; | [Y]US2009260239 (CERWIN JOHN [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,10,13,14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-22 * | by applicant | DE102010064118 | DE102010040995 | GB2396437 |