EP2854274 - Power supply circuit and luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Go c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Shinichiro c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Bokinge, Ole Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 14156100.1 | 21.02.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | JP20130202792 | 27.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013202792 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2854274 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2854274 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H05B33/08 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H02M3/33553 (EP,US);
H02H7/1213 (US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M1/36 (EP,US);
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/14 (EP);
H05B45/382 (EP,US);
H05B45/39 (EP,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stromversorgungskreis und Leuchte | [2015/14] | English: | Power supply circuit and luminaire | [2015/14] | French: | Circuit d'alimentation électrique et luminaire | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008144339 (HSIEH GUAN-CHYUN [TW], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6; | [XI] - Anonymous, "Application Note AN-4151Half-bridge LLC Resonant Converter Design Using FSFR-series Fairchild Power Switch (FPS)", (20071009), Fairchild semiconductor, URL: http://www.datasheetarchive.com/dl/Datasheet-080/DASF003547.pdf, (20150305), XP002736868 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-6 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Using the UCC25600EVM - User's Guide", (20090430), Texas Instrument, URL: http://www.ti.com.cn/cn/lit/ug/sluu361/sluu361.pdf, (20150305), XP002736869 [Y] 3-5 * the whole document * |