EP2779459 - Biased bang-bang phase detector for clock and data recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1320 Ridder Park Dr. San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malipatil, Amaresh V. 1403 Foothill Meadows Ct San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
Srinivasa, Sunil 358 Calado Avenue Campbell, California 95008 / US | 03 /
Healey, Adam B. 38 Winter Street Newburyport, Massachusetts 01950 / US | 04 /
Aziz, Pervez M. 9916 Burnham Dr. Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14157040.8 | 27.02.2014 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | US201361790046P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361790046 P | US201313866888 | 19.04.2013 Original published format: US201313866888 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2779459 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/08, H03L7/089, H03L7/091, H04L7/033 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
H03L7/0807 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (US);
H03L7/089 (EP,US);
H03L7/091 (EP,US);
H04L7/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2014/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorgespannter Zweipunkt-Phasendetektor für Takt- und Datenrückgewinnung | [2014/38] | English: | Biased bang-bang phase detector for clock and data recovery | [2014/38] | French: | Détecteur de phase par commande tout ou rien sollicitée pour récupération de signaux d'horloge et de données | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 24.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7292662 (GREGORIUS PETER [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044]; figure 2A *; | [X]US2009074125 (LIN CHIA-LIANG [US]) [X] 1-15* column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 24; figures 3-7 * |