EP2913973 - Trusted NFC smart poster tag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyn, Hauke c/o NXP Semiconductors High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Gallo, Francesco c/o NXP Semiconductors High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Lesjak, Christian c/o NXP Semiconductors High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 14157090.3 | 27.02.2014 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913973 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04W12/10 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04W12/106 (EP,US);
H04L2209/805 (EP);
H04L63/0823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zuverlässige NFC-Smart-Poster-Etikett | [2015/36] | English: | Trusted NFC smart poster tag | [2015/36] | French: | Étiquette d'affiche à puce NFC sécurisée | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 03.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2487629 (NXP BV [NL]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [0 10] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] *; | [Y] - NFC FORUM, "NFC Signature Record Type Definition (RTD) Technical Specification", INTERNET CITATION, (20101118), page 18pp, URL: http://members.nfc-forum.org/specs/spec_license, (20140205), XP009175987 [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-3; tables 1-8 * * sections 2, 3 * * Annex A * | [A] - Tony Rosati, Greg Zaverucha, "'Elliptic Curve Certificates and Signatures for NFC Signature Records'", RESEARCH IN MOTION, CERTICOM RESEARCH, (20110101), URL: http://members.nfc-forum.org/resources/white_papers/Using_ECQV_ECPVS_on_NFC_Tags.pdf, (20140626), XP055125263 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - MUHAMMAD QASIM SAEED ET AL, "Off-line NFC Tag Authentication", INTERNET TECHNOLOGY AND SECURED TRANSACTIONS, 2012 INTERNATIONAL CONFERECE FOR, IEEE, (20121210), ISBN 978-1-4673-5325-0, pages 730 - 735, XP032340705 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * sections I, III, IV, VII * |