EP2779463 - Background calibration of adc reference voltage errors due to input signal dependency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shen, Junhua 348 Franklin Street Unit 3A Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
Kapusta, Ronald A. 81 Wilson Road Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | 03 /
Guthrie, Edward C. 4 Monument Square Apt. 3 Charlestown, Massachusetts 02129 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Thompson, Andrew John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14157547.2 | 03.03.2014 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | US201361785167P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785167 P | US201314028767 | 17.09.2013 Original published format: US201314028767 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2779463 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2779463 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10, // H03M1/16, H03M1/44, H03M1/46 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
H03M1/1019 (EP,US);
H03M1/38 (US);
H03M1/164 (EP,US);
H03M1/44 (EP,US);
H03M1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hintergrundkalibrierung von durch Eingangssignalabhängigkeit verursachten Fehler in der Referenzspannung eines A/D-Wandlers | [2014/38] | English: | Background calibration of adc reference voltage errors due to input signal dependency | [2014/38] | French: | Calibrage d'arrière-plan des erreurs de la tension de référence d'un CAN due à la dépendance du signal d'entrée | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/11] | 31.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2019 | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5047772 (RIBNER DAVID B [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-15* column 2, line 32-38; column 3, line 54-68; column 4, line 1-3; column 5, line 41-43; column 6, line 1-2; column 10, line 20-24; column 10, line 35-38; column 11, line 18-22; column 11, line 31-33;; figures 3,5 *; | [X]US5319370 (DEL SIGNORE BRUCE D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 13-17; column 5, line 45-48; column 16, line 60-68; column 17, line 1-2; column 17, line 40-51;;; figure 1A *; | [X]US7495589 (TRIFONOV DIMITAR T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 25-26; column 4, line 47-51; column 4, line 56-61; column 5, line 15-19; column 7, line 31-33; column 7, line 58-59; column 17, line 46-53; column 17, line 58-67;; figure 3 * |