EP2775203 - Multi-fuel burner and method for heating an oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messer Austria GmbH Industriestrasse 5 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demuth, Martin Badenerstr 37/5 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Münzel, Joachim R. Messer Group GmbH Messer-Platz 1 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 14157701.5 | 04.03.2014 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | DE20131004016 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013004016 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775203 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2775203 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23D1/04 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
F23D1/04 (EP);
F23G5/008 (EP);
F23G5/20 (EP);
F23G7/12 (EP);
F23L7/007 (EP);
F23D2204/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2014/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 10.03.2015 | ME | 10.03.2015 | Title | German: | Mehrstoffbrenner und Verfahren zum Beheizen eines Ofenraums | [2014/37] | English: | Multi-fuel burner and method for heating an oven | [2014/37] | French: | Brûleur multi-combustibles et procédé de chauffage d'un four | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
14.08.2018
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/51] |
Former [2018/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
14.08.2018
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative De Vleeschauwer, Natalie Y.L.D. L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2018/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2018
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative De Vleeschauwer, Natalie Y.L.D. L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01 | 13.05.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | GB | 04.03.2018 | IE | 04.03.2018 | LU | 04.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 04.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 04.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 04.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
GB | 04.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006060867 (KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] *; | [XI]DE2905746 (PILLARD FEUERUNGEN GMBH) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, line 1 - line 5; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 4,5, 11-14 * * page 7, line 2 - line 15 * * page 8, line 17 - line 20 * [I] 9; | [XI]WO2008065554 (SMIDTH AS F L [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 1, line 3 - line 10; figures 2,3 * * page 1, line 21 - line 25 * * page 2, line 4 - line 10 * * page 3, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 13 - line 22 * * page 7, line 1 - line 29 * [I] 4,8,9 | by applicant | DE102010061496 | DE19648981 | DE19925875 | AT411928B | Opposition | DE19504667 | DE10133058 | - N0RSKOV et al., "Combustion of solid alternative fuels in the cement kiln burner", Industrial PhD thesis, Technical University of Denmark, (20120000), URL: http://orbit.dtu.dk/files/74227236/PhD._thesis_Linda_N_rskov_31072012.PDF, XP055477603 | - ANDREAS HAND, "Technology Options for the Cement Industry with the Use of Alternative Fuels", ALF-Cemind Workshop, Athen, (20070516), pages 1 - 35, URL: http://alf-cemind.com/docs/presentations/KHD%20presentation.pdf, XP055477613 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-72731-6 | - "The next generation Duoflex burner is here", FLSmidth Highlights, (20081100), page 15, XP055477614 | - "Holcim España burns alternative fuel with state-of-the-art equipment", FLSmidth Highlights, (20051100), pages 26 - 28, XP055477680 | - "Co-operation produces results", FLSmidth Highlights, (20030400), pages 5 - 7, XP055477685 | - "Integrated solutions for alternative fuels", FLSmidth Highlights, (20090500), page 22, XP055477689 | - CHRISTIAN HELMREICH, "Innovative burning", International Cement Review, (20071100), pages 55 - 57, XP055477693 | - ATEC, "Practical Guide to Alternative Fuel Utilisation", Cement & Building Materials Review, (20100300), vol. 39, pages 36 - 43, XP055477700 | - MAX VACCARO, "Burning Alternative Fuels in Rotary Cement Kilns", Cement Industry Technical Conference, (20060000), pages 127 - 136, XP010918579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CITCON.2006.1635711 | - Hassan Fawzy Mohamed Elattar, "Flame Simulation in Rotary Kilns Using Computational Fluid Dynamics", Dissertation, Universität Magdeburg, (20110908), XP055477713 | - "Burners for advanced alternative fuel usage", ECRA Newsletter, (20100200), pages 2 - 3, XP055477727 | - "Oxygen-enhanced cement and lime production that can help improve your kiln operations... tell me more", Air Products and Chemicals, Inc, (20120000), XP055477738 |