EP2740702 - Device for detecting the discarding state of a high-strength fibre rope during use on a lifting gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/24] | Device for detecting the discarding state of a high-strength fibre rope during use on lifting gear | ||
[2015/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach/Riß / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilaka, Mupende Marshallstrasse 162/1 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 02 /
Zerza, Horst Gymnasiumstr. 10 88400 Biberach / DE | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/24] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158060.5 | 24.01.2012 | [2014/24] | Priority number, date | DE20112001846U | 24.01.2011 Original published format: DE 202011001846 U | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2740702 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2740702 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2740702 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66C15/00, B66C13/16, B66D1/54, G01N3/08, G01N33/36, B66C15/06 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
B66C13/16 (EP,BR,US);
B66C15/00 (EP,BR,US);
B66C13/18 (US);
B66C15/06 (US);
B66D1/54 (EP,BR,US);
G01N3/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2014/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erkennung der Ablegereife eines hochfesten Faserseils beim Einsatz an Hebezeugen | [2014/24] | English: | Device for detecting the discarding state of a high-strength fibre rope during use on a lifting gear | [2015/17] | French: | Dispositif de détection de l'état d'usure d'un câble en fibre haute résistance pour une utilisation sur des engins de levage | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/24] | Device for detecting the discarding state of a high-strength fibre rope during use on lifting gear | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12701226.8 / EP2668127 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20120701226) is 14.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | RS | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | IE | 24.01.2016 | LU | 24.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 02.09.2015 | |
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5664603 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO); | [A]JPS60253810 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]JPH0912271 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACH); | [A]JPH09188496 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACH); | [A]JPH10318741 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [A]JP2000327272 (HITACHI LTD); | [AD]DE19956265 (LIEBHERR WERK EHINGEN [DE]); | [Y]US2003052695 (SMITH RORY [US]); | [Y]JP2005189157 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) | by applicant | EP0749934 | DE19956265 |