EP2784026 - Active substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ise, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Harada, Yasuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Inagaki, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Takami, Norio c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/05] |
Former [2014/40] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158621.4 | 10.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | JP20130065040 | 26.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013065040 | JP20140045366 | 07.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014045366 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784026 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2784026 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01G33/00, C01G35/00, C01G39/00, C01G49/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/485 (KR,US);
H01M4/362 (CN);
C01G33/00 (EP,CN,US);
C01G33/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01G35/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01G39/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01G49/0018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01G49/009 (KR);
H01M10/05 (CN);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (CN,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (KR,US);
H01M4/483 (CN);
H01M4/525 (KR,US);
H01M4/625 (KR,US);
H01M50/204 (KR);
H01M50/284 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H02J7/0029 (KR);
C01P2002/72 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/74 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (KR);
H01M50/105 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/224 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/227 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/231 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/70 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | Wirkstoff | [2014/40] | English: | Active substance | [2014/40] | French: | Substance active | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 06.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2014 | AL | 03.02.2016 | AT | 03.02.2016 | BE | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | ES | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | IE | 10.03.2016 | LU | 10.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.03.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.03.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012016185 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 30 *; | [A]EP2448054 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0043]; figures 9,10 *; | [A]EP2503625 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0010] - [0017]; examples 1,2 *; | [A] - XIA LU ET AL, "Atomic-scale investigation on lithium storage mechanism in TiNb2O7,", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (20110101), vol. 4, no. 8, doi:10.1039/c0ee00808g, ISSN 1754-5692, page 2638, XP055124833 [A] 1-9 * page 2639; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0ee00808g | by applicant | JP2010287496 | - M. GASPERI, JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE CHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 53, pages 144 - 147 | - LIQUAN CHEN ET AL., ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 4, pages 2638 - 2644 |