EP2779378 - Grounding device for electric machine and methods of assembling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regal Beloit America, Inc. 200 State Street Beloit, WI 53511 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muehlbauer, Gerald, R 100 East Randolph Street Wausau, WI 54401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | 01 /
Muehlbauer, Gerald, R 100 East Randolph Street Wausau, WI Wisconsin 54401 / US | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14158994.5 | 11.03.2014 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | US201313826927 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313826927 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2779378 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2779378 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K11/04, H02K11/40 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H02K11/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | H02K11/00, H02K11/04 | ||
Former IPC [2014/38] | H02K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2014/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erdungsvorrichtung für elektrische Maschine sowie Verfahren zu deren Montage | [2016/34] | English: | Grounding device for electric machine and methods of assembling the same | [2014/38] | French: | Dispositif de mise à la terre pour machine électrique et procédés d'assemblage de celui-ci | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/38] | Erdungsvorrichtung für elektrische Maschine und Verfahren zur dessen Montage | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6062847 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XAI]DE102009004060 (LUIKEN ENNO [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,10,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * [A] 2,5-8,12-14 [I] 4; | [X]DE202011106900U (SCHUNK BAHN & INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * abstract ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] *; | [XI]US2013032373 (CUTSFORTH ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,3,9,10,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0056] * [I] 4,11 |